NY A03471 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Decreases the amount of alcohol in a person's system necessary to be considered to be intoxicated while hunting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Decreases the amount of alcohol in a person's system necessary to be considered to be intoxicated while hunting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23Senatesigned chap.388
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-03-27SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-27SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-27Senate3RD READING CAL.311
2019-03-27SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2417
2019-03-26SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-03-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-26Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.153
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02417 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3471

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03471&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03471&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03471
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03471&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03471&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03471&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A3471#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback