NY A03475 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the town of Brookhaven, in the county of Suffolk, to lease parklands to the Patchogue-Medford Library.
Title
Relates to authorizing the town of Brookhaven, in the county of Suffolk, to lease parklands to the Patchogue-Medford Library.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] |
Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.300 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-13 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.115 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | substituted for a3475 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.380 |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | substituted by s2877 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | home rule request |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.115 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.115 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02877 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.300