NY A03483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to restrict the definitions of "commercial purpose or use" and "mixed-use property".
Title
Authorizes municipalities to restrict the definitions of "commercial purpose or use" and "mixed-use property".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05254 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - approval memo.59