NY A03486 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensing board in the county of Westchester and requirements in a cause of action.
Title
Relates to the licensing board in the county of Westchester and requirements in a cause of action.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.693 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.434 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4222 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.154 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04222 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.693