NY A03514 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - print number 3514b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - print number 3514b
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for expanded ownership in design professional corporations by employee stock ownership plans and non-licensed employees.
Title
Provides for expanded ownership in design professional corporations by employee stock ownership plans and non-licensed employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assembly | print number 3514b |
2020-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | print number 3514a |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S02709 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to higher education