NY A03534 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 3534a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - amended on third reading 3534a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.
Title
Creates, in addition to the existing sanction of criminal contempt of court, the remedies of labor law civil penalties and employee's right to bring civil action for unlawful discharge, penalty or discrimination on account of the exercise by an employee of a juror's right to be absent from employment by reason of jury service.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Barbara Lifton [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3534a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.145 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.288 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S03351 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY