NY A03535 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the commission on retired racehorses, which shall be responsible for the oversight of retired racehorses including the creation of a registry to track such racehorses.
Title
Establishes the commission on retired racehorses, which shall be responsible for the oversight of retired racehorses including the creation of a registry to track such racehorses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming And Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-21 | Senate | amended on third reading 3535b |
2020-01-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.146 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1974B |
2020-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.337 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a3535a |
2019-06-11 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1974A |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.231 |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s1974a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.337 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.337 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | print number 3535a |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to racing and wagering |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S01974 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - PRINT NUMBER 1974B