NY A03543 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - signed chap.438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - signed chap.438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes consolidation of certain voting districts with a small number of eligible voters; such district must have fewer than ten eligible voters.
Title
Authorizes consolidation of certain voting districts with a small number of eligible voters; such district must have fewer than ten eligible voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | signed chap.438 |
2019-10-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1721 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6449 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06449 (Same As) 2019-10-30 - signed chap.438