NY A03552 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s2394
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to payment in construction contracts; specifies the meaning of "substantial completion" for the purposes of requisition payments in construction contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to payment in construction contracts; specifies the meaning of "substantial completion" for the purposes of requisition payments in construction contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s2394
2019-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.702
2019-06-20Assemblyreported
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S02394 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback