NY A03570 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-14)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases fines for leaving scene of an accident without reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases fines for leaving scene of an accident without reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 3570a
2019-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2019-01-29Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04443 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback