NY A03584 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-14 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for procedure in filling vacancies in the offices of comptroller and attorney-general.
Title
Provides for procedure in filling vacancies in the offices of comptroller and attorney-general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |