NY A03599 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a temporary state commission on personal privacy, in light of the rapid advancement of technology in recent years, and provides for its powers, functions and duties; provides that said commission shall undertake a comprehensive study of the condition of personal privacy in the state and how best to protect it; directs the commission to report its findings and recommendations to the governor and the legislature.
Title
Creates a temporary state commission on personal privacy, in light of the rapid advancement of technology in recent years, and provides for its powers, functions and duties; provides that said commission shall undertake a comprehensive study of the condition of personal privacy in the state and how best to protect it; directs the commission to report its findings and recommendations to the governor and the legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Michael Spano [R] | Asm. Nelson Castro [D] |
Asm. William Boyland [D] | Asm. John McEneny [D] | Asm. Annette Robinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | print number 3599b |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2012-05-29 | Assembly | print number 3599a |
2012-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2011-01-26 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S03680 (Same As) 2011-03-02 - REFERRED TO FINANCE