NY A03615 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Implements provisions to limit state revenue growth; creates a revenue limitation; establishes a budget stabilization fund; sets rates for allowable growth; exempts emergencies declared by the governor; permits taxpayers to bring action to enforce revenue limitations.
Title
Implements provisions to limit state revenue growth; creates a revenue limitation; establishes a budget stabilization fund; sets rates for allowable growth; exempts emergencies declared by the governor; permits taxpayers to bring action to enforce revenue limitations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |