NY A03634 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to determination of state contribution for certain benefits provided pursuant to collective bargaining agreements.
Title
Relates to determination of state contribution for certain benefits provided pursuant to collective bargaining agreements.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] |
Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] | Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | committed to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S02051 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE