NY A03635 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.198
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes mead in various alcohol taxes and licenses.
Title
Includes mead in various alcohol taxes and licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.198 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-03-27 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-03-27 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-03-27 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.155 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | substituted for a3635 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to economic development |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.17 |
2019-01-11 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | substituted by s1263 |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.155 |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S01263 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.198