NY A03636 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the inclusion of a confession of judgment in a contract or agreement for a financial product or service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the inclusion of a confession of judgment in a contract or agreement for a financial product or service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-30Assemblyreferred to banks

Same As/Similar To

S03851 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback