NY A03654 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits approved organizations providing coverage under the child health insurance plan from discriminating against health care providers which do not participate in the organization's health care network.
Title
Prohibits approved organizations providing coverage under the child health insurance plan from discriminating against health care providers which do not participate in the organization's health care network.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.149 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.111 |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06760 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH