NY A03658 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - ordered to third reading rules cal.254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of freshwater wetlands; repeals section relating to the applicability of the freshwater wetlands article; provides authority of DEC over wetlands which are one acre or more; amends permitting requirements for subdivision of land.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of freshwater wetlands; repeals section relating to the applicability of the freshwater wetlands article; provides authority of DEC over wetlands which are one acre or more; amends permitting requirements for subdivision of land.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.254
2019-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.254
2019-06-13Assemblyreported
2019-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-30Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S05576 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback