NY A03666 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates certain acts by the Roscoe central school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the education department.
Title
Validates certain acts by the Roscoe central school district in connection with final building cost reports required to be filed with the education department.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.12 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.463 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-30 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-30 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.403 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | substituted for a3666 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.602 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s2611 |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.403 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02611 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - APPROVAL MEMO.12