NY A03673 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting the issuance of permits authorizing the use of wild animals in circuses; excepts an accredited zoo and a wildlife sanctuary.
Title
Relates to prohibiting the issuance of permits authorizing the use of wild animals in circuses; excepts an accredited zoo and a wildlife sanctuary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.151 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.496 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05408 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION