NY A03694 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - approval memo.13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to establishing the mental health and substance use disorder parity report act to ensure compliance of insurers and health plans with state and federal requirements for the provision of mental health and substance use disorder treatment and claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to establishing the mental health and substance use disorder parity report act to ensure compliance of insurers and health plans with state and federal requirements for the provision of mental health and substance use disorder treatment and claims.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senateapproval memo.13
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.455
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.2106
2018-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S1156C
2018-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.218
2018-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.218
2018-06-14Assemblyreported
2018-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-31Assemblyprint number 3694c
2018-05-31Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2018-01-31Assemblyprint number 3694b
2018-01-31Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to insurance
2017-06-08Assemblyprint number 3694a
2017-06-08Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to insurance
2017-01-30Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S01156 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3694C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03694
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03694A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03694B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03694C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03694&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A3694#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback