NY A03726 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - print number 3726b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides an exemption for tangible personal property and services sold by a cemetery; establishes an amnesty program for cemetery corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides an exemption for tangible personal property and services sold by a cemetery; establishes an amnesty program for cemetery corporations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyprint number 3726b
2019-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-06-06Assemblyprint number 3726a
2019-06-06Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-30Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S03701 (Same As) 2019-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 3701B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback