NY A03753 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - print number 3753b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - print number 3753b
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant and a physical therapist assistant.
Title
Authorizes treatment of workers' compensation injuries by an occupational therapy assistant and a physical therapist assistant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Assembly | print number 3753b |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | print number 3753a |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to labor |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S03969 (Same As) 2020-07-21 - referred to labor