NY A03767 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the microenterprise development act to assist very small businesses and low-income business people.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the microenterprise development act to assist very small businesses and low-income business people.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Small Business Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatetabled
2018-12-07Senatevetoed memo.276
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1564
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6892
2018-03-19SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2018-03-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.286
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-24SenateREFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS
2017-05-24Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-24Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.410
2017-05-16Assemblyreported
2017-05-02Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-30Assemblyreferred to small business

Same As/Similar To

S06892 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3767

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03767&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03767&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03767
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03767&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03767&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03767&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A3767#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback