NY A03801 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes minimum educational requirements of certain town and village justices.
Title
Establishes minimum educational requirements of certain town and village justices.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] |
Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.153 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.190 |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07692 (Same As) 2020-02-07 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY