NY A03822 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the instilling of mydriatic or cycloplegic eye drops by persons qualified and supervised by a licensed optometrist or ophthalmologist.
Title
Relates to the instilling of mydriatic or cycloplegic eye drops by persons qualified and supervised by a licensed optometrist or ophthalmologist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.517 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.544 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a3822d |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4469B |
2019-06-04 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4469A |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.695 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4469b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.544 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.544 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 3822d |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | print number 3822c |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | print number 3822b |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | print number 3822a |
2019-03-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04469 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.517