NY A03823 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - print number 3823a
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds gabapentin to the prescription monitoring program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds gabapentin to the prescription monitoring program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 3823a
2019-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2019-02-28Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03906 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback