NY A03840 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring that information be made available to parents regarding window blind safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring that information be made available to parents regarding window blind safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-22Senate3RD READING CAL.820
2019-05-22SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4181
2019-03-05SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2019-03-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-05Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.78
2019-02-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S04181 (Same As) 2019-05-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3840

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback