NY A03876 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - print number 3876b
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the New York state climate leadership and community protection act; relates to climate change; renewable energy program; labor and job standards and worker protection.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]
Asm. Kevin Cahill [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. William Colton [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]
Asm. Jamie Romeo [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Tremaine Wright [D]
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Sean Ryan [D]
Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]
Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Taylor Raynor [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]
Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]
Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]

Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyprint number 3876b
2019-06-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to rules
2019-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 3876a
2019-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-02-05Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02992 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - PRINT NUMBER 2992B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03876
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03876A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03876B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03876&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback