NY A03892 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-16)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s1676a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s1676a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to establish and implement a museum education grant program to provide state aid to museums, historical societies, nature centers, zoos, botanical gardens, arboretums, aquariums and cultural organizations to establish education programs for elementary and secondary school students, and for those participating in continuing education in low-income urban, suburban or rural communities.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to establish and implement a museum education grant program to provide state aid to museums, historical societies, nature centers, zoos, botanical gardens, arboretums, aquariums and cultural organizations to establish education programs for elementary and secondary school students, and for those participating in continuing education in low-income urban, suburban or rural communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s1676a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.402 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.402 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | print number 3892a |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S01676 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.307