NY A03937 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on October 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-03 - signed chap.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the requirements for a license as a professional land surveyor.
Title
Relates to the requirements for a license as a professional land surveyor.
Sponsors
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Jaime Williams [D] |
Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Senate | signed chap.322 |
2019-10-01 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1368 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6316 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.119 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.119 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 3937a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06316 (Same As) 2019-10-03 - signed chap.322