NY A03939 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-13 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would: (1) consolidate and streamline the police officer and peace officer registries; (2) update and enhance peace officer training requirements; and (3) grant peace officer status to uniformed court officers employed by the Village of Northport justice court.
Title
An act to amend the criminal procedure law, in relation to granting peace officer status to uniformed court officers for the village of Northport justice court
Sponsors
Asm. Andrew Raia [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-07-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-13 | tabled | |
2009-08-11 | vetoed memo.33 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.757 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2940 | |
2009-06-01 | REFERRED TO CODES | |
2009-06-01 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-01 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-28 | advanced to third reading cal.654 | |
2009-05-27 | reported | |
2009-01-29 | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S2940 (Same As) 2009-07-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3939