NY A03939 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s4413
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes age sixteen as the minimum age for assisting in the conduct of any game of bingo.
Title
Establishes age sixteen as the minimum age for assisting in the conduct of any game of bingo.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4413 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.122 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
2015-01-28 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S04413 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - VETOED MEMO.273