NY A03958 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - signed chap.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-02 - signed chap.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the provision of guides containing best practices for retaining employees who are informal caregivers; provides that such guide shall be available on the websites of the state office for the aging, the department of labor and the department of state.
Title
Requires the provision of guides containing best practices for retaining employees who are informal caregivers; provides that such guide shall be available on the websites of the state office for the aging, the department of labor and the department of state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Aging Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-02 | Senate | signed chap.309 |
2018-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1622 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8739 |
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.300 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.512 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | referred to aging |