NY A03993 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.158
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities issued by courts or by the department of corrections and community supervision.
Title
Relates to certificates of relief from disabilities issued by courts or by the department of corrections and community supervision.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. Latrice Walker [D] |
Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Joseph Lentol [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.158 |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.165 |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | referred to correction |