NY A04055 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "bird-friendly building council act" to establish a council to promote the use of bird-friendly building materials and design features in buildings; research the magnitude of problems facing birds colliding with buildings; identify existing and emerging products, technologies and concepts to reduce or eliminate bird mortality from building collisions; and develop public awareness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "bird-friendly building council act" to establish a council to promote the use of bird-friendly building materials and design features in buildings; research the magnitude of problems facing birds colliding with buildings; identify existing and emerging products, technologies and concepts to reduce or eliminate bird mortality from building collisions; and develop public awareness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-16Assemblyprint number 4055b
2019-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-04-05Assemblyprint number 4055a
2019-04-05Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental operations
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S00025 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - referred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback