NY A04061 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to defining the terms "retiree" and "beneficiary" within the freedom of information law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to defining the terms "retiree" and "beneficiary" within the freedom of information law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2019-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.80
2019-02-27Assemblyreported
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback