NY A04064 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.390
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to registered dental assisting; increases the age for registered dental assisting from seventeen to eighteen years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to registered dental assisting; increases the age for registered dental assisting from seventeen to eighteen years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-23Senatesigned chap.390
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.828
2019-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4558
2019-05-14SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2019-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.291
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-01-31Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S04558 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4064

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback