NY A04068 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of tampering with electronic monitoring equipment in the first and second degree.
Title
Creates the crime of tampering with electronic monitoring equipment in the first and second degree.
Sponsors
Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Michael Benedetto [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | print number 4068a |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S05422 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - referred to codes