NY A04070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - print number 4070a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - print number 4070a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to terminal rental adjustment clauses in motor vehicle leases; provides that any increase in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall be subject to tax, and that any decrease in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall allow the lessor to claim a credit or refund of tax on such amount.
Title
Relates to terminal rental adjustment clauses in motor vehicle leases; provides that any increase in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall be subject to tax, and that any decrease in the consideration given pursuant to such clause upon termination of the lease shall allow the lessor to claim a credit or refund of tax on such amount.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Assembly | print number 4070a |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03067 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - PRINT NUMBER 3067A