NY A04072 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.588
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.588
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospitals to offer plant-based food options to patients upon request.
Title
Requires hospitals to offer plant-based food options to patients upon request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.588 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.82 |
2019-06-03 | Senate | substituted for a4072a |
2019-06-03 | Senate | referred to health |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1471A |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.619 |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s1471a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4072a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.82 |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01471 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.588