NY A04074 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to municipal directors of weights and measures, permitting the county of Westchester to designate its commissioner or director of consumer affairs as its director of weights and measures.
Title
Relates to municipal directors of weights and measures, permitting the county of Westchester to designate its commissioner or director of consumer affairs as its director of weights and measures.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.350 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.499 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a4074a |
2019-05-29 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.555 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s5110 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.499 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | print number 4074a |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05110 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.350