NY A04076 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - print number 4076b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - print number 4076b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing for electronic notarization; authorizes the use of video and audio conference technology in identifying individuals for electronic notarization.
Title
Relates to providing for electronic notarization; authorizes the use of video and audio conference technology in identifying individuals for electronic notarization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Assembly | print number 4076b |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | print number 4076a |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04352 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - referred to governmental operations