NY A04077 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation to include species designated by the Secretary of the Interior as endangered or threatened to the endangered and threatened species list.
Title
Requires the commissioner of the department of environmental conservation to include species designated by the Secretary of the Interior as endangered or threatened to the endangered and threatened species list.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-21 | Senate | signed chap.170 |
2020-09-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.957 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8750 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.225 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.225 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | print number 4077a |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05196 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - referred to environmental conservation
S08750 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170
S08750 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - signed chap.170