NY A04079 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-03 - held for consideration in transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of transportation to keep open the high occupancy vehicle lane on certain areas of I-278 for twenty-four hour periods.
Title
Directs the department of transportation to keep open the high occupancy vehicle lane on certain areas of I-278 for twenty-four hour periods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Assembly | held for consideration in transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02963 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - referred to transportation