NY A04079 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-13)
Status: Enrolled on October 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to increasing certain special accidental death benefits; increases the special accidental death benefit paid to a widow or widower or the deceased member's children under the age of eighteen, or if a student, under the age of twenty-three.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to increasing certain special accidental death benefits; increases the special accidental death benefit paid to a widow or widower or the deceased member's children under the age of eighteen, or if a student, under the age of twenty-three.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1679
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3168B
2019-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.76
2019-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.76
2019-06-05Assemblyreported
2019-06-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-21Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-17Assemblyprint number 4079b
2019-05-17Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2019-02-07Assemblyprint number 4079a
2019-02-07Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2019-02-01Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S03168 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4079B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04079
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04079A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A04079B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A04079&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A4079#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback