NY A04081 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - signed chap.46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the date for filing the certificate of nomination for new parties to the first of September preceding the general election.
Title
Changes the date for filing the certificate of nomination for new parties to the first of September preceding the general election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | Senate | signed chap.46 |
2019-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.395 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4426 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.83 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S04426 (Same As) 2019-07-03 - signed chap.46