NY A04088 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - print number 4088a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-31 - print number 4088a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring commercial parking garages to install and operate pedestrian warning devices where vehicles exiting such garage cross a pedestrian sidewalk; requires both visual and audible warning signals.
Title
Relates to requiring commercial parking garages to install and operate pedestrian warning devices where vehicles exiting such garage cross a pedestrian sidewalk; requires both visual and audible warning signals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Assembly | print number 4088a |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-02-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S00454 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION