NY A04109 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.579
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - signed chap.579
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the community guardian program shall obtain annually a statement prepared by a physician, psychologist, nurse clinician, social worker, or other person, evaluating the condition and current functional level of the person for whom the community guardian program serves as guardian; the appointing court should be informed of the results of the evaluation.
Title
Provides the community guardian program shall obtain annually a statement prepared by a physician, psychologist, nurse clinician, social worker, or other person, evaluating the condition and current functional level of the person for whom the community guardian program serves as guardian; the appointing court should be informed of the results of the evaluation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | signed chap.579 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1688 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4285A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4109b |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-29 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.114 |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | print number 4109a |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S04285 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - signed chap.579