NY A04163 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-04 - print number 4163b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-04 - print number 4163b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a credit against income tax for the rehabilitation of distressed residential properties; allows a credit equal to thirty percent of the qualified rehabilitation expenditures made by the taxpayer with respect to a qualified distressed residential property; requires property that qualifies must be constructed prior to January 1, 1962 in a distressed residential or mixed-use neighborhood.
Title
Establishes a credit against income tax for the rehabilitation of distressed residential properties; allows a credit equal to thirty percent of the qualified rehabilitation expenditures made by the taxpayer with respect to a qualified distressed residential property; requires property that qualifies must be constructed prior to January 1, 1962 in a distressed residential or mixed-use neighborhood.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Assembly | print number 4163b |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | print number 4163a |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-02-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02739 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - referred to ways and means